US HB6021 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Northern Mariana Islands Small Business Development Act This bill expands eligibility for certain Small Business Administration programs to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Northern Mariana Islands Small Business Development Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
2020-09-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4345-4346)
2020-09-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6021.
2020-09-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4345-4346)
2020-09-14HouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-03-11HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-03-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2020-02-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2603 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB2190 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB6395 (Related) 2020-08-05 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback