US HB6 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 176-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the cancellation of removal and adjustment of status of certain aliens, and for other purposes.
Title
Dream Act of 2021 American Promise Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - On passage (Y: 228 N: 197 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 203 N: 216 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 203 N: 216 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-18 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 197 (Roll no. 91). (text: CR H1507-1512) |
2021-03-18 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 203 - 216 (Roll no. 90). |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1567-1568) |
2021-03-18 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, the House resumed consideration of H.R. 6. |
2021-03-18 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further consideration of H.R. 6 is postponed. |
2021-03-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jordan motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the motion to recommit, and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Jordan demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-03-18 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-18 | House | Mr. Jordan moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H1526) |
2021-03-18 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868 and H.J. Res. 17. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868, and H.J.Res. 17. The resolution provides that H.Res. 232 is hereby adopted. |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 233. (consideration: CR H1507-1527) |
2021-03-16 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 233 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868 and H.J. Res. 17. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868, and H.J.Res. 17. The resolution provides that H.Res. 232 is hereby adopted. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR233 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB6637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.