US HB597 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2017 (Sec. 4) This bill takes into trust for the benefit of the Lytton Rancheria of California certain land owned by the tribe in Sonoma County, California. Land taken into trust is made a part of the tribe's reservation. (Sec. 5) Gaming is prohibited on land taken into trust by this bill and in a specified area of Sonoma County. Gaming is prohibited until March 16, 2037, on land taken into trust for the benefit of the tribe after enactment of this bill. (Sec. 6) The memorandum of agreement entered into by the tribe and the county that was approved by the county on March 10, 2015, is not subject to review or approval by the Department of the Interior.
Title
Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625. |
2018-10-05 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-344. |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2017-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5415-5416) |
2017-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 597. |
2017-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5415-5416) |
2017-07-11 | House | Mr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139. |
2017-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-202. |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |