US HB5964 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cross-Border Trade Enhancement Act of 2012 - Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to enter into agreements with persons for the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to provide customs and immigration services at a land border port of entry, subject to payment of a fee to reimburse the CBP for providing such services. Directs the Administrator of General Services to establish procedures for evaluating proposals submitted by persons to: (1) enter into cost-sharing or reimbursement agreements with the General Services Administration (GSA) for the construction or maintenance of infrastructure at a land border port of entry, and (2) provide GSA an unconditional gift of property for use in the construction or maintenance of such infrastructure. Prescribes minimum requirements for such procedures.
Title
Cross-Border Trade Enhancement Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement. |
2012-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2012-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2012-06-19 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2012-06-19 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2012-06-19 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2012-06-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3279 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB5968 (Related) 2012-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
HB5968 (Related) 2012-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Customs enforcement
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
User charges and fees
Customs enforcement
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/5964/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr5964/BILLS-112hr5964ih.pdf |