US HB595 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Small Business Administration from providing aid, counsel, or assistance to a small business concern that (1) is headquartered in China, or (2) has more than 25% of voting stock owned by citizens of China.
Title
Denying Chinese Investors Access to U.S. Small Business Aid Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB75 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB8497 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8666 (Related) 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8497 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8666 (Related) 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
China
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international corporations
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
U.S. and foreign investments
Asia
China
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international corporations
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
U.S. and foreign investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/595/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr595/BILLS-116hr595ih.pdf |