US HB5934 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To improve the effectiveness and performance of certain Federal financial assistance programs, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Streamlining Federal Grants Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
2023-10-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2286 (Related) 2023-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 271.
SB2471 (Related) 2023-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback