US HB5921 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from authorizing certain transactions by a United States financial institution in connection with Iran, to prevent the International Monetary Fund from providing financial assistance to Iran, to codify prohibitions on Export-Import Bank financing for the Government of Iran, and for other purposes.
Title
No U.S. Financing for Iran Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Richard McCormick [R-GA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. John James [R-MI] | Rep. Keith Self [R-TX] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 123 (Y: 294 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2024-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 294 - 105 (Roll no. 123). (text: CR H2376) |
2024-04-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2384-2385) |
2024-04-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-04-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5921. |
2024-04-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2376-2378) |
2024-04-15 | House | Mr. McHenry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-12-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 271. |
2023-12-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-332. |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 12. |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |