US HB5906 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ARPA-E Act of 2018 This bill amends the America COMPETES Act to require the Advanced Research Projects Agency-Energy (ARPA-E) in the Department of Energy (DOE) to overcome the long-term and high-risk technological barriers in the development of transformative science and technology solutions to address energy, environmental, economic, and national security challenges. (Currently, ARPA-E must overcome barriers in the development of energy technologies.) The bill expands the goals of ARPA-E to include the development of energy technologies that: provide transformative solutions to improve management of radioactive waste, improve the efficiency and reduce the environmental impact of energy production, and address other challenges within the mission of DOE. The bill expands the responsibility of ARPA-E to accelerate novel early-stage research to include nonenergy research. ARPA-E must: include a strategic vision roadmap in each annual report on energy technology projects or advanced technology projects, and ensure that it does not fund an advanced technology project unless the prospective grantee has demonstrated that it has sufficiently attempted to secure private financing or that such project is not independently commercially viable. Specified categories of proprietary information collected by ARPA-E from award recipients shall be considered privileged and confidential and not subject to disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
ARPA-E Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-06-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5779) |
2018-06-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5906. |
2018-06-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5779-5781) |
2018-06-27 | House | Mr. Lucas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2018-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |