US HB5891 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the Federal Response to Families Impacted by Substance Use Disorder Act
Title
Improving the Federal Response to Families Impacted by Substance Use Disorder Act
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 264 (Y: 409 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 8 (Roll no. 264). (text: CR H5127-5128) |
2018-06-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5136-5137) |
2018-06-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5891. |
2018-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5127-5129) |
2018-06-13 | House | Mr. Grothman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.