US HB5889 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Early Childhood Trauma Related to Substance Abuse Act of 2018 This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services to provide resources to early childhood care and education providers and other professionals working with young children on ways to recognize and respond to children who may be affected by a family member's or other adult's substance abuse. Such resources must include information on risk-assessment, age-appropriate care, and response options that support the whole family.
Title
Recognizing Early Childhood Trauma Related to Substance Abuse Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5124) |
2018-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5889. |
2018-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5123-5125) |
2018-06-13 | House | Mr. Brat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.