US HB588 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Securing Access to Networks in Disasters Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to submit to Congress and publish on the FCC website a study on the public safety benefits, technical feasibility, and cost of providing the public with access to 9-1-1 services during times of emergency when mobile service is unavailable, through: telecommunications service provider-owned WiFi access points and other communications technologies operating on unlicensed spectrum, without requiring any login credentials; non-telecommunications service provider-owned WiFi access points; and other alternative means. The types of emergencies subject to this bill are: (1) occasions or instances under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act for which the President determines that federal assistance is needed to supplement state and local efforts and capabilities to save lives and to protect property and public health and safety, or to lessen or avert the threat of a catastrophe in any part of the United States; or (2) an emergency declared by the governor of a state or U.S. territory. (Sec. 3) The Stafford Act is amended to expand the categories of essential service providers that may access a disaster site to restore and repair essential services in an emergency or major disaster without being denied or impeded by a federal agency. Services to be considered essential are wireline or mobile telephone service, Internet access service, radio or television broadcasting, cable service, or direct broadcast satellite service.
Title
Securing Access to Networks in Disasters Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-01-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H579) |
2017-01-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 588. |
2017-01-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H579-581) |
2017-01-23 | House | Mr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB102 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Held at the desk.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication