US HB588 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vietnam Veterans Donor Acknowledgment Act of 2013 - Extends, to November 17, 2018, the legislative authority of the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Fund, Inc. (Fund) to establish a Vietnam Veterans Memorial visitors center. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to allow the Fund to acknowledge donor contributions to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Visitor Center by displaying, inside the Center, an appropriate statement or credit. Requires the Fund to: (1) bear all display expenses; and (2) prior to such display, submit to the Secretary for approval a display plan. Requires the Secretary to approve such plan if it: (1) allows only short, discrete, and unobtrusive acknowledgments or credits; (2) does not permit any advertising slogans or company logos; and (3) conforms to applicable National Park Service guidelines for indoor donor recognition. Allows the Fund, if a plan is not approved, to resubmit a revised plan.
Title
Vietnam Veterans Donor Acknowledgment Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] |
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] |
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 398 N: 2 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-21. |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5623) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment pursuant to H. Res. 264 (consideration: CR H3660-3661) |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | S.AMDT.1154 Amendment SA 1154 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | S.AMDT.1154 Amendment SA 1154 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Wyden. (consideration: CR S3912; text: CR S3912)In the nature of a substitute. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3912; text: CR S3912) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-05-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-05-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 2 (Roll no. 129). (text: CR H2409) |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2412-2413) |
2013-05-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-05-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 588. |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2409-2410) |
2013-05-06 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 16. |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-28. |
2013-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-20 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-03-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HR264 (Related) 2013-06-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Asia
District of Columbia
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
District of Columbia
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam