US HB5877 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-304.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-304.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
United States-Israel Advanced Research Partnership Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 and the United States-Israel Strategic Partnership Act of 2014 to allow the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), in coordination with the Department of State, to enter cooperative programs with Israel to enhance capabilities in cybersecurity through: the international cooperation program established by DHS's Under Secretary for Science and Technology to enter into cooperative research activities with foreign partner governments that are allies in the global war on terrorism, and the Homeland Security Advanced Research Projects Agency (HSARPA). The pilot project designation is removed from the HSARPA's cooperative research programs with Israel for border, maritime, and aviation security; explosives detection; and emergency services. The international cooperative activities report submitted every five years by the Science and Technology Homeland Security International Cooperative Programs Office must contain: (1) a status update on the progress of such international cooperative activities identified in the previous reporting period; and (2) a discussion of obstacles encountered in forming, executing, or implementing agreements for such activities.
Title
United States-Israel Advanced Research Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-304. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7109) |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6332) |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5877. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6332-6334) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-11-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 649. |
2016-11-15 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2016-11-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-827, Part I. |
2016-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-08-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies. |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Firearms and explosives
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Middle East
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Firearms and explosives
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Middle East
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security