US HB583 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Timely Repatriation Act Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to publish a report every six months listing countries that have: (1) refused or unreasonably delayed repatriation of an alien who is a national of that country, and the total number of such aliens; and (2) an excessive repatriation failure rate. Directs the Secretary of State with respect to a listed country: (1) to not issue visas to attendants, servants, and personal employees of such country's diplomats and officials/employees; and (2) reduce the number of visas available for such country's diplomats and officials/employees by 10% for each six months that a country is listed. Authorizes the Secretary of DHS to exempt a country from inclusion if the total number of nonrepatriations outstanding is less than 10% for the preceding 3-year period.
Title
Timely Repatriation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1148 (Related) 2015-03-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13.
SB1640 (Related) 2015-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1640 (Related) 2015-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Sanctions
Visas and passports
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Sanctions
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/583/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr583/BILLS-114hr583ih.pdf |