US HB582 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 206-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to increase the federal minimum wage for regular employees over a 7-year period, for tipped employees, and for newly hired employees who are less than 20 years old. The bill eliminates the separate minimum wage requirements for tipped and newly hired employees. After a specified period, these employees shall be paid the same minimum wage as regular employees. (Sec. 6) The bill sets forth a schedule of annual increases in the federal minimum wage for individuals with disabilities. The Department of Labor shall no longer issue special certificates for the payment of subminimum wages to such individuals after the final wage increase under this bill for such individuals takes effect. Labor shall provide, upon request, technical assistance and information to employers to (1) help them transition their practices to comply with wage increases and other requirements under this bill for individuals with disabilities, and (2) ensure continuing employment opportunities for such individuals. The bill eliminates the separate minimum wage requirements for disabled employees. After a specified period, these employees shall be paid the same minimum wage as regular employees. (Sec. 7) Labor must publish any increase in the minimum wage in the Federal Register and on its website 60 days before it takes effect. (Sec. 8) The Government Accountability Office (GAO) must submit a report to Congress, with respect to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, that (1) assesses the status and structure of the economy of the Northern Mariana Islands, and (2) for each year in which a wage increase will take effect, estimates the proportion of employees who will be directly affected by each such increase taking effect for that year. (Sec. 9) The GAO must also report on the impact of the first and second wage increases on business enterprises.
Title
Raise the Wage Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-18 - House - On passage RC# 496 (Y: 231 N: 199 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-18 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 495 (Y: 210 N: 218 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-07-18 - House - On agreeing to the O'Halleran amendment (A002) H.Amdt.596 RC# 494 (Y: 248 N: 181 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-18 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 495 (Y: 210 N: 218 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-07-18 - House - On agreeing to the O'Halleran amendment (A002) H.Amdt.596 RC# 494 (Y: 248 N: 181 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-07-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-18 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 231 - 199 (Roll no. 496). |
2019-07-18 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 210 - 218 (Roll no. 495). |
2019-07-18 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2019-07-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Meuser motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment adding a section pertaining to Small Business Surivival which shall not apply to an enterprise that employs fewer than 10 individuals and whose annual gross volume of sales made or business done is less than $1,000,000. |
2019-07-18 | House | Mr. Meuser moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Education and Labor. (text: CR H7126) |
2019-07-18 | House | H.Amdt.596 On agreeing to the O'Halleran amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 248 - 181 (Roll no. 494). |
2019-07-18 | House | H.Amdt.596 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) and on the bill pursuant to the rule. |
2019-07-18 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 492, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the O'Halleran amendment No. 1. |
2019-07-18 | House | H.Amdt.596 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. O'Halleran. (consideration: CR H7123-7126; text: CR H7123-7124) |
2019-07-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 582. |
2019-07-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 582 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. |
2019-07-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 492. (consideration: CR H7095-7128; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H7095-7096) |
2019-07-17 | House | Rule H. Res. 492 passed House. |
2019-07-15 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 492 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 582 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. |
2019-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 112. |
2019-07-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 116-150. |
2019-03-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 20. |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB150 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR492 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4306 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR492 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4306 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Wages and earnings
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Wages and earnings