US HB582 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ConTACT Act of 2015 Concussion Treatment and Care Tools Act of 2015 Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish guidelines for states on the implementation of best practices for diagnosis, treatment, and management of mild traumatic brain injuries (MTBIs) in school-aged children, including best practices relating to student athletes returning to play after an MTBI. Requires the Pediatric MTBI Guideline Expert Panel of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to issue a final report on best practices by July 31, 2015. Authorizes HHS to make grants to states to: (1) adopt, disseminate, and ensure schools implement the guidelines; and (2) ensure elementary and secondary schools implement computerized preseason baseline and post-injury neuropsychological testing for student athletes. Directs HHS to require states receiving grants to utilize, to the extent practicable, applicable expertise and services offered by local chapters of national brain injury organizations.
Title
ConTACT Act of 2015 Concussion Treatment and Care Tools Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB307 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Elementary and secondary education
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Neurological disorders
School athletics
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Elementary and secondary education
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Neurological disorders
School athletics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/582/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr582/BILLS-114hr582ih.pdf |