US HB5809 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 586.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 586.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Postoperative Opioid Prevention Act of 2018 This bill temporarily increases payment under Medicare for certain non-opioid analgesics that are used for pain management in hospital outpatient department services.
Title
Postoperative Opioid Prevention Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 586. |
2018-06-13 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2018-06-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-753, Part I. |
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 17. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Medicare
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Medicare