US HB5808 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 561.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 561.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Pharmaceutical Home Act of 2018 This bill requires state Medicaid programs to establish drug-management programs for at-risk beneficiaries (those identified as at risk of abusing or misusing controlled substances).
Title
Medicaid Pharmaceutical Home Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 561. |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-726. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Medicaid
Medicare
Mental health
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Right of privacy
State and local government operations
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Medicaid
Medicare
Mental health
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Right of privacy
State and local government operations