US HB5806 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the review by the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States of greenfield investments by the People's Republic of China.
Title
Exposing China’s Belt and Road Investment in America Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2021-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3038 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4792 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4792 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5806/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5806/BILLS-117hr5806ih.pdf |