US HB5804 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to enhance the Blue Campaign of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Blue Campaign Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5086-5087) |
2020-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5804. |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5086-5088) |
2020-09-30 | House | Ms. Underwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399. |
2020-09-11 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-09-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-498, Part I. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8309 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers