US HB5804 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Post-Surgical Injections as an Opioid Alternative Act This bill temporarily freezes Medicare payment at 2016 levels for specified spinal surgery outpatient procedures that are conducted in ambulatory surgical centers.
Title
Post-Surgical Injections as an Opioid Alternative Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 585. |
2018-06-13 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2018-06-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-752, Part I. |
2018-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 14. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia