US HB5800 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid IMD ADDITIONAL INFO Act Medicaid Institutes for Mental Disease Are Decisive in Delivering Inpatient Treatment for Individuals but Opportunities for Needed Access are Limited without Information Needed about Facility Obligations Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Medicaid and Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) Payment and Access Commission to report on information relating to services for Medicaid enrollees who are patients in institutions for mental diseases (IMDs), including: (1) the number and type of IMDs in each sampled state and associated coverage limitations, (2) services and processes provided at such IMDs, (3) applicable federal waivers and other Medicaid funding sources for such IMDs, (4) state requirements for such IMDs to receive funding, and (5) recommendations to improve standards and data collection for IMDs.
Title
Medicaid IMD ADDITIONAL INFO Act Medicaid Institutes for Mental Disease Are Decisive in Delivering Inpatient Treatment for Individuals but Opportunities for Needed Access are Limited without Information Needed about Facility Obligations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5040-5041) |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5800. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5040-5042) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 552. |
2018-06-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-717. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.