US HB5790 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XI of the Social Security Act to provide for clinical psychologist services models to be tested by the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, and for other purposes. This bill specifies that the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation may test models to: (1) help individuals learn about the availability of psychologist services under Medicare, and (2) explore the use of a behavioral health help-line that is available 24-7 to prevent unnecessary hospitalizations and emergency department visits through treatment education. The Government Accountability Office must report on the availability of behavioral health services under Medicare.
Title
To amend title XI of the Social Security Act to provide for clinical psychologist services models to be tested by the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5776 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-764, Part I.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5790/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5790/BILLS-115hr5790ih.pdf |