US HB578 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-8)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) and the city of Vallejo, California, to enter into an agreement to transfer Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, to the VA to be maintained as a national shrine.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to seek to enter into an agreement with the city of Vallejo, California, for the transfer of Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB127 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S226)
SB2983 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6039 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
SB2983 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6039 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
California
Cemeteries and funerals
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
California
Cemeteries and funerals
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/578/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr578/BILLS-116hr578ih.pdf |