US HB5778 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting Outpatient Access to Non-Opioid Treatments Act This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to review payments under Medicare for opioid and non-opioid pain management procedures, specifically with respect to ambulatory outpatient surgical procedures and hospital outpatient department services. The CMS must ensure that there are no payment incentives for using opioids instead of non-opioid alternatives and must make revisions accordingly.
Title
Promoting Outpatient Access to Non-Opioid Treatments Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5776 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-764, Part I.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5778/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5778/BILLS-115hr5778ih.pdf |