US HB5744 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Catastrophic Wildfire Prevention Act of 2012 - Authorizes the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA), with respect to National Forest System lands, and the Secretary of the Interior, with respect to public lands, (the Secretaries) to implement authorized wildfire prevention projects in at-risk forests and threatened and endangered species in a manner that focuses on surface, ladder, and canopy fuels reduction activities. Requires projects carried out on threatened and endangered species habitat to: (1) provide enhanced protection from wildfire, including catastrophic wildfire, for the endangered species, threatened species, or their habitat; and (2) comply with applicable recovery plan guidelines. Requires projects carried out in at-risk forests to move the federal land from condition class II or III toward condition class I. Permits use in a project of: (1) domestic livestock grazing to reduce surface fuel loads and to recover burned areas; and (2) timber harvesting and thinning to reduce ladder and canopy fuel loads for the prevention of wildfire, including catastrophic wildfires. Directs the Secretaries to review public petitions for, and make determinations with respect to, the designation of federal lands as at-risk forests or as threatened and endangered species habitats. Requires notice in the Federal Register of proposed projects and final designated projects and permits public comment on projects as specified. Instructs the Secretaries to prepare an environmental assessment for projects that include timber harvesting or grazing. Instructs the Secretaries to research what impact any listing of a species under the Endangered Species Act of 1973 would have on both forage and timber forest fuel loads. Requires endangered species recovery plans and critical habitat determinations to include a wildfire risk assessment analysis.
Title
Catastrophic Wildfire Prevention Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Rick Berg [R-ND] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Benjamin Quayle [R-AZ] | Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-05-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2012-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2012-05-15 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2012-05-15 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2012-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3409 (Related) 2012-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/5744/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr5744/BILLS-112hr5744ih.pdf |