US HB5742 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soledad Canyon Settlement Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to offer to cancel Bureau of Land Management (BLM) mineral contracts CA-20139 and CA-22901 (located in Soledad Canyon, California) and compensate the contract holder for the cancellation with proceeds from the sale of lands near Victorville, California. Withdraws affected areas from mineral leasing.
Title
Soledad Canyon Settlement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9050-9051) |
2014-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5742. |
2014-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9050-9053) |
2014-12-11 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-11-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2014-11-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Related) 2013-11-20 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-342.
SB2938 (Same As) 2014-11-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2938 (Same As) 2014-11-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
California
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Mining
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Mining
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources