US HB5738 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to require a lactation space in each medical center of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Lactation Spaces for Veteran Moms Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-05-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 214). (text: CR H5104-5105) |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5140-5141) |
2022-05-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5738. |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5104-5105) |
2022-05-18 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-03-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-10-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4580 (Related) 2022-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.