US HB5735 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
THRIVE Act Transitional Housing for Recovery in Viable Environments Demonstration Program Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the United States Housing Act of 1937 to require the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to establish a five-year demonstration program for nonprofit organizations and tribally designated housing entities to provide low-income rental-assistance vouchers to individuals recovering from an opioid or other substance-use disorder. Specifically, these vouchers shall be provided through a supportive housing program that provides treatment for such disorders and coordination with workforce development providers. HUD may waive, or specify alternative requirements for, any provision of statute or regulation governing the use of these vouchers (except for requirements relating to fair housing, nondiscrimination, labor standards, or the environment) if such waiver or alternative is necessary.
Title
THRIVE Act Transitional Housing for Recovery in Viable Environments Demonstration Program Act
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - On passage RC# 266 (Y: 230 N: 173 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-06-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-14 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 173 (Roll no. 266). |
2018-06-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5184-5185) |
2018-06-14 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5735, the Chair put the question on passage, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Hensarling demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced. |
2018-06-14 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2018-06-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-06-14 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 5735. |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.787 On agreeing to the Biggs amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 934, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Biggs amendment No. 4. |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.787 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Biggs. (consideration: CR H5183; text: CR H5183) |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.786 On agreeing to the Moore amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 934, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Moore amendment No. 3. |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.786 Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Moore. (consideration: CR H5182-5183; text: CR H5182) |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.785 On agreeing to the Rohrabacher amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 934, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rohrabacher amendment No. 2. |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.785 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Rohrabacher. (consideration: CR H5181-5182; text: CR H5181-5182) |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.784 On agreeing to the Barr amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 934, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Barr amendment No. 1. |
2018-06-14 | House | H.Amdt.784 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Barr. (consideration: CR H5180-5181; text: CR H5180) |
2018-06-14 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 5735. |
2018-06-14 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 934 and Rule XVIII. |
2018-06-14 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Michael K. Simpson to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2018-06-14 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2851, H.R. 5735 and H.R. 5788 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2018-06-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 934. (consideration: CR H5172-5183; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H5179-5180) |
2018-06-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 934 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2851, H.R. 5735 and H.R. 5788 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 554. |
2018-06-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-719. |
2018-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 19. |
2018-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR934 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing