US HB5725 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BEST Act Benefit Evaluation of Safe Treatment Act of 2018 This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to report on the availability of supplemental health care benefits for the prevention and treatment of substance use disorders under Medicare Advantage (MA) plans, including differences between MA plans for certain individuals with special needs and other MA plans.
Title
BEST Act Benefit Evaluation of Safe Treatment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5776 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-764, Part I.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5725/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5725/BILLS-115hr5725ih.pdf |