US HB5717 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To address the surge in illegal border crossings along the southwest border by establishing new ports of entry for processing migrants in accordance with the Immigration and Nationality Act and section 362 of the Public Health Service Act.
Title
Stop the SURGE Act Stop the Surge of Unsafe Rio Grande Encampments Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3002 (Same As) 2021-10-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5717/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5717/BILLS-117hr5717ih.pdf |