US HB5711 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Access to Mental Health Services Act
Title
Improving Access to Mental Health Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2533 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5711/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5711/BILLS-115hr5711ih.pdf |