US HB5698 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protect and Serve Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to make it a crime to knowingly assault a law enforcement officer causing serious bodily injury (or to attempt to do so) in circumstances that affect interstate commerce. It imposes criminal penalties—a prison term of up to 10 years, a fine, or both—on a violator.
Title
Protect and Serve Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - On passage RC# 188 (Y: 382 N: 35 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-05-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-16 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 382 - 35 (Roll no. 188). |
2018-05-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4057) |
2018-05-16 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5698, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Goodlatte demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of H.R. 5698 until later in the legislative day. |
2018-05-16 | House | H.Amdt.584 On agreeing to the Goodlatte amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-05-16 | House | H.Amdt.584 The previous question was ordered on the amendment and bill without objection. |
2018-05-16 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 891, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Goodlatte amendment No. 1. |
2018-05-16 | House | H.Amdt.584 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Goodlatte. (consideration: CR H5014; text: CR H5014) |
2018-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5698. |
2018-05-16 | House | ORDER OF BUSINESS - Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting the amendment H.R. 5698 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20. |
2018-05-16 | House | The resolution provides for 1 hour of general on all three bills. For H.R. 5698 and H.R. 2, the resolution provides for consideration under a structured rule. For S. 2372, the resolution provides for consideration under a closed rule. Finally, the resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on all three bills. |
2018-05-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H4009-40014; text of measure as reported in House: CR H4009) |
2018-05-15 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. The resolution provides for 1 hour of general on all three bills. For H.R. 5698 and H.R. 2, the resolution provides for consideration under a structured rule. For S. 2372, the resolution provides for consideration under a closed rule. Finally, the resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on all three bills. |
2018-05-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517. |
2018-05-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-672. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2794 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR891 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers