US HB5695 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Updates references in the U.S. Code to certain provisions in Title 25 (Indians). In 2016, Congress transferred certain provisions in Chapter 14 (Miscellaneous) and Chapter 19 (Indian Land Claims Settlements) of Title 25 to new chapters at the end of the title as part of an effort to reclassify the code. To reflect the reclassification of the code, this bill updates references to Title 25.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make technical amendments to update statutory references to certain provisions which were formerly classified to chapters 14 and 19 of title 25, United States Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 415 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-12-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-12-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 5 (Roll no. 432). (text: 12/01/2021 CR H6755-6763)
2021-12-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7548)
2021-12-01HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-12-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5695.
2021-12-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6755-6764)
2021-12-01HouseMr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-11-30HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 49.
2021-11-30HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-190.
2021-11-03HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-11-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-10-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-10-22HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback