US HB5695 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emmett's Law This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and the Health Resources and Services Administration to notify annually health care providers about health information that may be disclosed under federal privacy laws to families, caregivers, and health care providers during emergencies, including overdoses. The notification may be included in other (already required) training materials for health care providers relating to permitted disclosures of patients' mental or substance use disorder treatment information.
Title
Emmett's Law
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2676 (Related) 2018-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5009 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5009 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5695/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5695/BILLS-115hr5695ih.pdf |