US HB5690 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GAO Access and Oversight Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to obtain federal agency records required to discharge the GAO's duties (including audit, evaluation, and investigative duties), including through bringing civil actions to require an agency to produce a record. No provision of the Social Security Act shall be construed to limit, amend, or supersede the GAO's authority to: (1) obtain information or inspect records about an agency's duties, powers, activities, organization, or financial transactions; or (2) obtain other agency records that the GAO requires to discharge its duties. Agency statements on actions taken or planned in response to GAO recommendations must be submitted to: (1) the congressional committees with jurisdiction over the pertinent agency program or activity, and (2) the GAO.
Title
GAO Access and Oversight Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 404 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 404 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 404 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Senate | Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640. |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 0 (Roll no. 523). (text: CR H5663) |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5695-5696) |
2016-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5690. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5663-5664) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Carter (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-09-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 590. |
2016-09-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-758. |
2016-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-07-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional oversight
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional oversight
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations