US HB569 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reserve Retirement Deployment Credit Correction Act This bill provides for retroactive calculation as of October 7, 2001, (the start of combat operations in Afghanistan) of qualifying active duty or active service days as a member of the Ready Reserve in order to reduce the eligibility age for receipt of retired pay for non-regular service. The current calculation date is January 28, 2008.
Title
Reserve Retirement Deployment Credit Correction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/569/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr569/BILLS-115hr569ih.pdf |