US HB569 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Equal Justice for Our Military Act of 2010 - Amends the federal judicial code to allow for review by writ of certiorari of certain cases denied relief or review by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces. Declares that the time for application for such a writ shall be as prescribed by rules of the Supreme Court.
Title
Equal Justice for Our Military Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] |
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] |
Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Eric Massa [D-NY] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D-TX] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] |
Rep. Ike Skelton [D-MO] | Rep. Ellen Tauscher [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wexler [D-FL] | Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312. | |
2010-07-15 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-547. | |
2010-01-27 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-01-27 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-07-30 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-07-30 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-06-11 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-29 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts and Competition Policy. | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB357 (Related) 2009-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1125)
Subjects
Federal appellate courts
Judicial review and appeals
Law
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Supreme Court
Judicial review and appeals
Law
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Supreme Court