US HB567 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides statutory authority for the Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Program, an interagency program launched in 2005 to partner with countries in the Sahel and Maghreb regions of Africa to counter terrorism and violent extremism. The Department of State, in consultation with the Department of Defense and the U.S. Agency for International Development, shall establish the partnership program, which must coordinate all U.S. programs in North and West Africa related to various counterterrorism activities, such as building foreign-military capacity, enhancing border security, promoting youth employment, and supporting independent media to counter terrorist propaganda. The State Department must submit comprehensive, five-year strategies that include specified activities for the Sahel and Maghreb regions and for program counterterrorism efforts. Further, program activities must, among other things (1) be carried out in countries where there is an adequate level of partner country committment, and (2) have clearly defined outcomes and specific plans with indicators to regularly monitor and evaluate outcomes and impact. Such activities must also take into account the counterterrorism and development strategies of partner countries and align with such strategies to the extent possible. The State Department shall notify Congress before obligating funds for such programs, and must submit annual reports about program activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Program Act of 2021 Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Program Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 395 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2021-06-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-06-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 15 (Roll no. 192). (text: 06/28/2021 CR H3171-3173)
2021-06-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3262-3263)
2021-06-28HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-06-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 567.
2021-06-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3171-3174)
2021-06-28HouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-02-25HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-02-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB615 (Related) 2021-03-24 - Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback