US HB5657 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to make marijuana accessible for use by qualified marijuana researchers for medical purposes, and for other purposes.
Title
Medical Marijuana Research Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 343 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-04-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 343 - 75 (Roll no. 108). (text: CR H4136-4138) |
2022-04-04 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4144-4145) |
2022-04-04 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5657. |
2022-04-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4136-4140) |
2022-04-04 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1126) |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced in House |