US HB5652 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish the Acquisition Review Board in the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6294-6295) |
2021-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5652. |
2021-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6294-6296) |
2021-11-16 | House | Mr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-10-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-26 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged. |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-10-20 | House | Introduced in House |