US HB5649 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Navy SEAL Chief Petty Officer William "Bill" Mulder (Ret.) Transition Improvement Act of 2018
Title
Navy SEAL Chief Petty Officer William "Bill" Mulder (Ret.) Transition Improvement Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7135-7137) |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5649. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7134-7140) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-864, Part I. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-27 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3731-3732) |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4835 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
SB3310 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3965 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB4149 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB3310 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3965 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB4149 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.