US HB562 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VRAP Extension Act of 2013 - Amends the VOW to Hire Heroes Act of 2011 to extend through June 30, 2014, the veterans retraining assistance program. Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to submit to Congress an interim report on the retraining assistance provided under such program.
Title
VRAP Extension Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2013-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/562/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr562/BILLS-113hr562ih.pdf |