US HB5613 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CAH Act of 2016 Continuing Access to Hospitals Act of 2016 This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to continue to instruct Medicare contractors not to enforce requirements for direct physician supervision of outpatient therapeutic services in critical access and small rural hospitals through 2016. The Medicare Payment Advisory Commission must report on the effect of extending this instruction on: (1) Medicare beneficiaries, and (2) hospital staffing needs.
Title
CAH Act of 2016 Continuing Access to Hospitals Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 531). (text: CR 09/20/2016 H5681) |
2016-09-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5740-5741) |
2016-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5613. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5681-5682) |
2016-09-20 | House | Ms. Jenkins (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-07-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-696, Part I. |
2016-07-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-07-01 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-07-01 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2016-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |