US HB5600 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No Hero Left Untreated Act This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a one-year pilot program to provide access to magnetic EEG/EKG-guided resonance therapy technology to larger populations of veterans suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder, traumatic brain injury, military sexual trauma, chronic pain, or opiate addiction. The VA shall carry out the program at up to five VA facilities, including the proposed Center for Innovation.
Title
No Hero Left Untreated Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6343) |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5600. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6343-6344) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 641. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-817. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-06-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-06-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Crime victims
Department of Veterans Affairs
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Neurological disorders
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
Crime victims
Department of Veterans Affairs
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Neurological disorders
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care