US HB56 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gulf Coast Restoration Act - Establishes the Gulf Coast Ecosystem Restoration Task Force, which shall: (1) consult with, and provide recommendations to, the Chair of the Task Force regarding approval of State Coastal Ecosystem Restoration Plans submitted by the governors of Alabama, Florida, Louisiana, Mississippi, and Texas providing for restoration activities the Gulf Coast ecosystem adversely impacted by the blowout and explosion of the mobile offshore drilling unit Deepwater Horizon on April 20, 2010; (2) coordinate scientific and other research associated with restoration of such ecosystem; and (3) submit an annual report to Congress that summarizes the Plans approved by the Chair. Establishes in the Treasury the Gulf Coast Ecosystem Restoration Fund. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to deposit into the Fund sums equal to not less than 80% of any amounts collected by the United States as penalties, settlements, or fines under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) in relation to the Deepwater Horizon explosion and resulting hydrocarbon releases into the environment. Makes the Fund available for the conservation, protection, and restoration of the Gulf Coast ecosystem in accordance with approved Plans.Requires the governors of such states to: (1) submit a Plan to the Chair by October 1, 2011; and (2) solicit local input and provide for public participation in the development of the Plan. Requires the Chair to disburse amounts from such Fund to such a state for which the Chair has approved a Plan only for: (1) projects and activities for the conservation, protection, or restoration of coastal areas, including wetlands; (2) mitigation of damage to fish, wildlife, or natural resources; (3) planning assistance and the administrative costs of complying with this Act; and/or (4) implementation of a federally approved marine, coastal, or comprehensive conservation management plan.
Title
Gulf Coast Restoration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Rodney Alexander [R-LA] | Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Jeffrey Landry [R-LA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2011-01-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2011-01-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1140 (Same As) 2011-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1870 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
HB1870 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Subjects
Accidents
Advisory bodies
Alabama
Aquatic ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Florida
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Oil and gas
Texas
Water quality
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Alabama
Aquatic ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Florida
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Oil and gas
Texas
Water quality
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/56/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr56/BILLS-112hr56ih.pdf |