US HB5590 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Addiction Action Plan Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to develop an action plan to provide recommendations on changes to the Medicare and Medicaid programs to enhance: (1) the treatment and prevention of opioid addiction, and (2) the coverage and payment of medication-assisted treatment for opioid addiction. The CMS must convene a stakeholder meeting to solicit public comment on the action plan. The CMS must also publish a report that includes an evaluation of price trends for opioid overdose-reversal drugs (e.g., naloxone) and recommendations on ways to lower consumer prices for such drugs.
Title
Opioid Addiction Action Plan Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-06-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5247-5248) |
2018-06-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5590. |
2018-06-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5247-5249) |
2018-06-19 | House | Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580. |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-746, Part I. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2769 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Public participation and lobbying
Rural conditions and development
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Public participation and lobbying
Rural conditions and development