US HB5587 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Peer Support Communities of Recovery Act This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to allow the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to award grants to nonprofits that focus on substance use disorder to establish regional technical assistance centers to provide assistance regarding implementation of peer-delivered addiction recovery support services, establishment of recovery community organizations and centers, and overdose reversal medication.
Title
Peer Support Communities of Recovery Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5069-5070) |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5587. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5069-5071) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-04-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations