US HB5572 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to award grants to certain nonprofits to develop or expand services for individuals with substance use disorders and their families. Activities may include (1) developing education, resources, and trainings on issues related to substance use disorders and family support; (2) reducing stigma; and (3) educating health care providers about substance use disorders in families.
Title
Family Support Services for Addiction Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5202) |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5202) |
2020-10-01 | House | VACATED PROCEEDINGS - Mrs. Lowey asked unanimous consent that the proceedings by which the yeas and nays were ordered on the motion to suspend the rules and pass H.R. 5572, as amended be vacated to the end that the Chair put the question de novo. Agreed to without objection |
2020-09-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House continued debate on H.R. 5572. |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5572. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5006-5008; text: CR H5006-5007) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 447. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-547. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3179 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Community life and organization
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Family relationships
Family services
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Performance measurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Community life and organization
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Family relationships
Family services
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Performance measurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations