US HB5559 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1496)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1496)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bridge to a Clean Energy Future Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2015 the following energy-related tax provisions: the tax credits for residential energy efficiency improvements, alternative fuel vehicle refueling property expenditures, two-wheeled plug-in electric vehicles, second generation biofuel production, biodiesel and renewable diesel fuel mixtures, producing electricity using Indian coal facilities, the construction of energy-efficient new homes, and new qualified fuel cell motor vehicles; the enhanced depreciation allowance for second generation biofuel plant property; the tax deduction for energy efficient commercial buildings; the excise tax credit for alternative fuels and fuels involving liquefied hydrogen; and tax deferral rules for sales or dispositions of qualified electric utilities. Extends through 2016, the tax credit for producing electricity using wind, biomass, geothermal, landfill gas, trash, hydropower, and marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy facilities. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to establish a program to consider and award certifications for qualified investments eligible for the advanced energy project tax credit. Limits the amount of credits that may be allocated under such program to not more than $5 billion (the 2013 allocation amount). Authorizes the Secretary to make direct payments to a taxpayer in lieu of a tax credit. Extends the energy tax credit to solar energy, fuel cell, microturbine, combined heath and power system, small wind energy, and thermal energy properties the construction of which begins before January 1, 2017.
Title
Bridge to a Clean Energy Future Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1496) |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Related) 2013-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2003 (Related) 2013-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2502 (Related) 2013-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3017 (Related) 2013-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB3758 (Related) 2013-12-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3951 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2260 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2763-2768)
SB2003 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5775 (Related) 2014-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2003 (Related) 2013-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2502 (Related) 2013-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3017 (Related) 2013-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB3758 (Related) 2013-12-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3951 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2260 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2763-2768)
SB2003 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5775 (Related) 2014-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Coal
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Indian lands and resources rights
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Motor fuels
Sales and excise taxes
Unemployment
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Coal
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Indian lands and resources rights
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Motor fuels
Sales and excise taxes
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5559/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5559/BILLS-113hr5559ih.pdf |